Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Cervera, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1707BornGata de Gorgos
12 Jun 176961.9AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
16 Jul 176962.0Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
12 May 177769.8AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
11 Jan 178173.4DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Cervera:
Bishop Juan Bautista Cervera O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 86, Number 435
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 144, and Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015