Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Raffl

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1858Born
15 Jul 188324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
28 Apr 192162.5AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
19 Jun 192162.6Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
15 Jul 192768.7DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann Raffl
Bishop Johann Raffl (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoppen

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 42
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018