Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignace Raad

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1923Born
9 Nov 194723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
9 Sep 198157.7AppointedArchbishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
30 Oct 198157.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
18 Sep 198561.7ResignedArchbishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
20 Jul 199975.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace Raad
Archbishop Ignace Raad (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saïdā (Sidone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKafar-Nabrakh

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast