Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Quaranta

Deceased

Bishop of Larino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643BornNapoli
14 Jun 168340.5AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
20 Jun 168340.5Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
9 Sep 168542.7DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Quaranta:
Bishop Giambattista Quaranta (died ) Bishop of Larino

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 236
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013