Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Power

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1809Born
16 Jun 183223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
20 May 187364.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
20 May 187364.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
12 Jun 187364.1SucceededBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
20 Jul 187364.2Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
17 Dec 188778.6DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Power
Bishop John Power (born , died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAffane
Ordained BishopSte Trinite, Cathedral, Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 167, and Page 596
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast