Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffrey de La Marthonie

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1576AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
25 Mar 1577Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
17 Dec 1617DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Geoffrey de La Marthonie
Bishop Geoffrey de La Marthonie (died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Death PlaceAmiens, Diocese of Amiens

  • a bishop for 40.7 years

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 106
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast