Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Bourgneuf de Cucé

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France

Bishop of Saint-Malo


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Dec 1586AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
23 May 1587Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Sep 1587Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 1598AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
17 Jul 1617DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Bourgneuf de Cucé
Bishop Charles de Bourgneuf de Cucé (died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceChartres

  • a priest for 29.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 231, and Page 253
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast