Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan (Jan) Snihurskyj (Snigurski)

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1784BornBrzesciany
15 Mar 180722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
30 Mar 181833.8AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
30 Aug 181834.2Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
24 Aug 184763.2DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Ivan (Jan) Snihurskyj (Snigurski):
Bishop Ivan (Jan) Snihurskyj (Snigurski) (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,539
  • opd/c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 11 Jul 2015