Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Rueda Rico

Deceased

Bishop of Tui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1575BornGranada
7 Feb 163963.3AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
8 Dec 163964.2DiedBishop of Tui, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Rueda Rico:
Bishop Diego Rueda Rico (born , died ) Bishop of Tui

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,161
  • b/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,852

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013