Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto del Cerro, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹BornToledo, Spain
6 Sep 163350.6SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
3 Apr 163451.2ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
18 Apr 163451.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
13 Oct 163552.7DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto del Cerro:
Bishop Jacinto del Cerro O.P. (born 1583, died ) Bishop of Gaeta

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 94, Number 561
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 161, Number 1,015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1634, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015