Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe della Corgna (Cornea), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1596³Born
27 May 162629.4AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
1 Jun 162629.5Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
22 Sep 163639.8AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
20 Mar 165659.3AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
23 Feb 167679.2ResignedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
27 Mar 167881.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Orvieto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe della Corgna (Cornea) (VIAF: 49361087)
Bishop Giuseppe della Corgna (Cornea) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglione del Lago, Diocese of Perugia
Ordained BishopPaul V Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 51.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 321, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 353
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 33
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 28 Nov 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,891

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast