Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard Pinelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹Born
19 Dec 164450.9AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
26 Dec 164450.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
18 Jan 164652.0DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Pinelli
Archbishop Bernard Pinelli C.R. (born 1594, died ) Archbishop of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast