Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octavius Rivarola

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1595BornChiavari
5 Jul 162732.4AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
25 Jul 162732.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
Oct 1651³56.7DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Octavius Rivarola:
Bishop Octavius Rivarola (born ) Bishop of Ajaccio

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 89, Number 530
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015