Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Pinelli (Sr.)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fermo

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1541BornGenova
14 Aug 157735.8AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
158442.2ResignedBishop of Fermo, Italy
18 Dec 158544.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158644.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
158745.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
14 Jan 159149.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
22 Apr 160260.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
19 Feb 160361.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
16 Jun 160361.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
1 Jun 160563.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
7 Feb 160765.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
9 Aug 161169.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pinelli (Sr.):
Cardinal Domenico Pinelli (Sr.) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fermo

  • a cardinal for 25.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1585

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013