Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal de Deza Manuel

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1520BornSevilla, Spain
21 Feb 157857.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 158060.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
9 Jan 158463.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
20 Apr 158767.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
18 Aug 159777.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
23 Apr 160080.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
18 Jun 160080.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albano
27 Aug 160080.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Deza Manuel:
Cardinal Pedro de Deza Manuel (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for .2 years
  • a cardinal for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013