Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Bovio, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1607AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
11 Feb 1607Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
12 Aug 1622DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Bovio
Bishop Juan Antonio Bovio O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Molfetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNavarre, Spain

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,832
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 238
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 122, Number 779
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,607, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast