Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Confetti

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹Born
10 May 160656.3AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
15 May 160656.3Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
8 Jan 163080.0DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Confetti:
Bishop Tommaso Confetti (died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015