Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Spínola, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Dec 1581ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
15 Apr 1602AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
28 Apr 1602Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
22 Dec 1613DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Spínola
Bishop Stefano Spínola C.R. (died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 363
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 31
  • ob/c2+: AT, 8 Aug 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,967

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Sep 2016