Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Parisi

Deceased

Bishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1599AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
2 Aug 1599AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
29 Aug 1599Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
24 Apr 1600SucceededBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
23 Apr 1614DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Parisi
Bishop Ascanio Parisi (died ) Bishop of Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 233, and Page 200
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 36, Number 181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast