Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Petrone

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1872Born
23 Sep 192149.0AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
28 Oct 192149.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
23 Mar 193360.5DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Petrone
Bishop Giuseppe Petrone (born , died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast