Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel dos Santos Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1827BornSanto Amaro
21 Nov 185225.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Dec 185326.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 189063.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
26 Jun 189063.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
31 Aug 189063.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
12 Sep 189366.5AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
25 Apr 190073.1DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel dos Santos Pereira:
Bishop Manoel dos Santos Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 263, and Page 424

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013