Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Paolo Giuseppe Antonino Michele Maria Mari, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1746BornCardano, Italy
23 Sep 176923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Mar 180458.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
29 Apr 180458.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
28 Dec 181468.7DiedTitular Bishop of Dora

MicroData Summary for Mauro Paolo Giuseppe Antonino Michele Maria Mari
Bishop Mauro Paolo Giuseppe Antonino Michele Maria Mari O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dora

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 8
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 178
  • d: CB, 10 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Sep 2016