Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Scipio Dondi Orologio

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1756Born
19 Feb 178024.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 180549.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
20 Oct 180549.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tremithus
18 Sep 180751.6AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
6 Oct 181963.7DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Scipio Dondi Orologio
Bishop Francesco Scipio Dondi Orologio (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 33
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 300, and Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast