Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Peckham, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1230¹BornSussex
1250¹20.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jan 127949.0AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
19 Feb 127949.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
8 Dec 129262.9DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Peckham
Archbishop John Peckham O.F.M. (born 1230, died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 14
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 65
  • OFM/b/prof: CB, 13 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016