Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Swinfield

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Dec 1282SelectedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
31 Dec 1282ConfirmedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
7 Mar 1283Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 1317DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Swinfield:
Bishop Richard Swinfield (died ) Bishop of Hereford

  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 274
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 66
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 460

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013