Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert of Saint Leofard

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1288AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
5 Sep 1288Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
12 Feb 1305DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert of Saint Leofard:
Bishop Gilbert of Saint Leofard (died ) Bishop of Chichester

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 187
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 67
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013