Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Beck

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1280SelectedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
6 Jul 1280ConfirmedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
6 Oct 1280Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
20 Apr 1293DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Beck:
Bishop Thomas Beck (died ) Bishop of Saint David’s

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 335
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 66
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013