Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William de La Corner

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Nov 1288AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
8 May 1289Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
14 Aug 1291DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William de La Corner:
Bishop William de La Corner (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 435
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 67
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013