Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William of Louth

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1290SelectedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
27 May 1290ConfirmedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 1290Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
25 Mar 1298DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William of Louth
Bishop William of Louth (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 238
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 67
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018