Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Kirkby

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jul 1286SelectedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
17 Aug 1286ConfirmedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 1286Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
26 Mar 1290DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Kirkby:
Bishop John Kirkby (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 238
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 67
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015