Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oliver Sutton

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Feb 1280SelectedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
19 May 1280Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
13 Nov 1299DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Oliver Sutton
Bishop Oliver Sutton (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 306
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 65
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018