Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Parise Loro, C.S.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Thagamuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1920Born
15 Aug 194424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Joseph
5 Oct 197454.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napo, Ecuador
5 Oct 197454.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagamuta
8 Dec 197454.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagamuta
27 Apr 197857.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
18 May 197857.8InstalledVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
2 Aug 199676.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
5 Oct 201090.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Julio Parise Loro
Bishop Julio Parise Loro C.S.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCologna Veneta, Italy

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast