Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Pandolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1631AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
18 May 1631Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
4 Oct 1648DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Pandolfi (VIAF: 37260630)
Bishop Alfonso Pandolfi (died ) Bishop of Comacchio

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 157
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 91, Number 545
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016