Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Palković, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci)

Titular Bishop of Druzipara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1715BornKismarkien
21 Dec 174025.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
12 Nov 174126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
4 Aug 175237.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci), Croatia
4 Aug 175237.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Druzipara
Sep 1752³37.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druzipara
25 Feb 175943.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Palković
Bishop Gabriel Palković O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Valachia

  • a priest for 17.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016