Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Paganelli

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636BornCamerinen
11 Sep 167337.7AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
1 Oct 167337.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
30 Jun 171074.5DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Paganelli:
Bishop Ascanio Paganelli (died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013