Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Negri

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1697BornVenezia
20 Sep 172124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
21 Jul 173235.3AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
25 Jul 173235.3Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
22 Jan 174244.8AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
Jan 1778³80.7DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Negri:
Bishop Gaspar Negri (born ) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 68, and Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013