Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Federico Orsini Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1693BornVenezia
8 Jan 171925.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 172936.8AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
6 Jan 173036.9Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
19 Dec 173845.8AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
Sep 1742³49.5DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Federico Orsini Rosa:
Bishop Giovanni Federico Orsini Rosa (born , died Sep 1742) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 407
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015