Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Ollivier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1791Born
21 Mar 181826.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
6 Apr 182432.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
6 Apr 182432.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
21 Aug 182533.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
27 May 182735.7DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Ollivier
Bishop Jean-François Ollivier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePleurtuit, France

  • a priest for 9.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 140
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast