Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Spínola

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Sep 1691Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 1691AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
18 Nov 1691Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
Sep 1714³DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Spínola:
Bishop Giorgio Spínola (died Sep 1714) Bishop of Albenga

  • a priest for 22.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75, and Page 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015