Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Ntahondereye

Bishop of Muyinga, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1953 Born
16 Nov 198027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ruyigi, Burundi
14 Dec 200249.5AppointedBishop of Muyinga, Burundi
1 Mar 200349.8Ordained BishopBishop of Muyinga, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Joachim Ntahondereye (VIAF: 6832822)
Bishop Joachim Ntahondereye (born ) Bishop of Muyinga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamzai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Muyinga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast