Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Noriega, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1650³Born
28 May 170050.3AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
31 May 170050.3Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
Mar 1708³58.1DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benito Noriega
Bishop Benito Noriega O.F.M. (born , died Mar 1708) Bishop of Acerra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo, Spain

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 19, Number 3
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast