Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Amel Shamon Nona

Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1967 BornAlqosh
11 Jan 199123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq
5 May 200941.5SelectedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
13 Nov 200942.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
8 Jan 201042.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
22 Jan 201042.2InstalledArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Jan 201547.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney (Chaldean), Australia

MicroData Summary for Amel Shamon Nona:
Archbishop Amel Shamon Nona (born ) Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney

Please contact the Archbishop through the Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,552
  • cx: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015