Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikha Pola Maqdassi

Bishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1949 Born
197323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq
6 Dec 200152.7AppointedBishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq
1 Feb 200252.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Mikha Pola Maqdassi
Bishop Mikha Pola Maqdassi (born ) Bishop of Alquoch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlquoch

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alquoch (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast