Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petros Hanna Issa Al-Harboli

Deceased

Bishop of Zaku (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1946BornZākhō
197023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
6 Dec 200155.4AppointedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
1 Feb 200255.5Ordained BishopBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Nov 201064.3DiedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Petros Hanna Issa Al-Harboli:
Bishop Petros Hanna Issa Al-Harboli (born , died ) Bishop of Zaku

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,124
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 15 Jan 2015