Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé de Narváez y Berrio

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1711¹BornCartagena
22 Oct 175140.8SelectedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
20 Dec 175140.9ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
10 Sep 175241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
6 Feb 175443.0DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de Narváez y Berrio:
Bishop Bartolomé de Narváez y Berrio (born 1711, died ) Bishop of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 150
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015