Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Muniz Alves, O.F.M.

Prelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1961 Born
2 Feb 198625.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jan 199130.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
4 Sep 199332.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Dec 201554.9AppointedPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
5 Mar 201655.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
3 Apr 201655.2InstalledPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Muniz Alves
Bishop João Muniz Alves O.F.M. (born ) Prelate of Xingu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarema

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Xingu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 24 Dec 2015
  • c2: CB, 7 Jan 2016
  • c34: CB, 22 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,854

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast