Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Luigi Cardinal Morichini

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1805Born
20 Dec 182823.0Ordained PriestPriest
Apr 1845³39.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
21 Apr 184539.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
25 May 184539.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
2 Aug 184741.6AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
15 Mar 185246.3Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 185246.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
23 Jun 185448.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Jesi, Italy
24 Nov 187166.0AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
22 Dec 187671.0AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
12 Mar 187771.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
15 Jul 187872.6AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
26 Apr 187973.4DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Luigi Morichini (VIAF: 25366577)
Carlo Luigi Cardinal Morichini (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Vallicela, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
  • a cardinal for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 79, and Page 153
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 43, and Page 48
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 23
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1852
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast