Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Cavallini Spadoni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Spoleto

Titular Archbishop of Adana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1804BornCingoli
22 Dec 182723.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187167.0AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
17 Dec 187167.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
6 Feb 1879³74.2RetiredArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
28 Feb 187974.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
18 Feb 188580.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Cavallini Spadoni:
Archbishop Domenico Cavallini Spadoni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Spoleto

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 74, and Page 527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013