Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Moreno y Ollo

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1714¹Born
19 Dec 176349.9AppointedBishop of Panamá
Jan 1766³52.0Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
12 Mar 177056.1AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
Feb 1780²66.0DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Moreno y Ollo
Bishop Miguel Moreno y Ollo (born 1714, died Feb 1780) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanama, Diocese of Panamá
Ordained BishopTrujillo, Diocese of Trujillo
Death PlaceHuamanga, Diocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231, and Page 326
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 48
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,656

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast