Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Trigona

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Messina

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1760BornCatania
20 Sep 178323.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 180645.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy
31 Mar 180645.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
19 Oct 180646.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
15 Mar 181756.5SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
28 Jul 181756.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
22 Nov 181959.2ResignedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
17 Dec 181959.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
1835¹74.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Trigona:
Archbishop Antonio Maria Trigona (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Messina

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 124, and Page 214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013